CA ACR39 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-16-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-16-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Speech and Debate Education Day.
Title
National Speech and Debate Education Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Assembly - ACR 39 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Special Consent ACR39 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - ACR 39 Gabriel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Special Consent ACR39 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - ACR 39 Gabriel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 956.). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 477.) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 603.) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 28). |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |