CA ACR38 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Joint Legislative Committee on Emergency Management.
Title
The Joint Legislative Committee on Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - Assembly - ACR 38 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR38 Bonnie Lowenthal By Kehoe (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR38 Bonnie Lowenthal By Kehoe (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-13 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |
2011-06-09 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1901.). | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-06-06 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1306.) | |
2011-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 25). | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS. | |
2011-03-25 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-25 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 699.) | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |
2011-03-15 | From printer. | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced. To print. |