CA ACR35 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-26)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Wines: Down to Earth Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Wines: Down to Earth Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Juan Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Sen. Tom Berryhill [R]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Sen. Jeff Stone [R]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR35 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2017.
2017-05-19AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-05-15SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1075.)
2017-05-09SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-03SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-24SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-04-20AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1126.)
2017-04-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 30).
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-16AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-03-15AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback