CA ACR34 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR34 Luz Rivas et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-04-12SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-04-12SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-15SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-03-11AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-03-04AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 4).
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-25AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-02-24AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback