CA ACR33 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-14-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-14-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lymphedema Awareness Day.
Title
Lymphedema Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Special Consent ACR33 Gloria et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 477.) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 602.) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 28). |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |