CA ACR3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Korean American Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Korean American Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-01-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-01-14AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2019-01-14AssemblyCoauthors Revised.
2019-01-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10).
2019-01-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-12-03AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback