CA ACR3 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-23)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Korean-American Day.
Title
Korean-American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett. | |
2012-05-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-16 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1387.) | |
2011-05-10 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-09 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2011-01-24 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 18). | |
2011-01-07 | From printer. | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced. To print. |