CA ACR28 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-18)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to sickle cell disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]Asm. William Brough [R]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 28 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-09-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-08-27SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-08-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2841.)
2019-08-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2019-08-14AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-26AssemblyMeasure version as amended on June 25 corrected.
2019-06-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended.
2019-05-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-02-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback