CA ACR28 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Earth Hour.
Title
Earth Hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR28 Chesbro (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - ACR 28 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - ACR 28 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-03-24 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 6. Page 437.) | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-21 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-21 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 642.) | |
2011-03-17 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (March 17). | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-25 | From printer. | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |