CA ACR26 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-22)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-22)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Special Consent Cal ACR26 Wilk (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 411.) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 652.) |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |