CA ACR250 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Arroyo Seco Victims Memorial Overcrossing.
Title
Arroyo Seco Victims Memorial Overcrossing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - ACR 250 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR250 Holden By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - ACR 250 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR250 Holden By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - ACR 250 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 7023.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5996.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6033.) |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-06-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |