CA ACR235 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-22)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Trauma-Informed Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trauma-Informed Awareness Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR235 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2018-06-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-07SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-06-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-30SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-21AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5256.)
2018-05-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2018-05-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-05-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback