CA ACR231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-25)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

May 2018: Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month.

Sponsors

Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Kevin de Leon [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR231 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2018-06-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-07SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4516.)
2018-06-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-14AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5154.)
2018-05-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-03AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-05-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback