CA ACR23 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Abraham Lincoln’s birthday.
Title
Abraham Lincoln’s birthday.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR23 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Assembly - ACR 23 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Assembly - ACR 23 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 307.) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 369.) |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 7). |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |