CA ACR220 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Private First Class Keith M. Williams Memorial Overpass.
Title
Private First Class Keith M. Williams Memorial Overpass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR220 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - ACR 220 MATHIS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - ACR 220 MATHIS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5279.) |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5821.) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |