CA ACR210 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-22)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Special Olympics Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Olympics Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR210 Frazier et al. By Portantino (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2018.
2018-05-03AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3978.)
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-04-12AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4640.)
2018-04-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2018-04-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-04-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback