CA ACR207 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-24)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Josh Newman [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Sen. Henry Stern [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]

Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Special Consent ACR207 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2018.
2018-05-24AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-05-21SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5122.)
2018-05-16SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-17SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-04-16AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4675.)
2018-04-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
2018-04-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-03-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback