CA ACR20 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-22-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Court Reporting and Captioning Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Court Reporting and Captioning Week.

Sponsors

Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. K H Achadjian [R]Asm. Luis Alejo [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Nora Campos [D]Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Sen. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Beth Gaines [R]Asm. Mike Gatto [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Richard Gordon [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Roger Hernandez [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Brian Jones [R]Asm. Young Kim [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Eric Linder [R]Asm. Patty Lopez [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Henry Perea [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Donald Wagner [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR20 Mark Stone By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-24AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2015.
2015-03-24AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
2015-03-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-03-19SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 358.)
2015-03-04SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2015-02-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2015-02-19AssemblyAmended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 341.)
2015-02-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 17).
2015-02-10AssemblyFrom printer.
2015-02-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback