CA ACR20 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-23)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education: instruction in world religions:

Sponsors

Asm. Dan Logue [R]Asm. Henry Perea [D]Asm. K H Achadjian [R]Asm. Luis Alejo [D]
Asm. Michael Allen [D]Asm. Tom Ammiano [D]Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Susan Bonilla [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]Asm. Cheryl Brown [D]Asm. Joan Buchanan [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Nora Campos [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D]Asm. Connie Conway [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Sen. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Roger Dickinson [D]Asm. Tim Donnelly [R]Sen. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Paul Fong [D]Asm. Steve Fox [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Beth Gaines [R]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gatto [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Richard Gordon [D]
Asm. Jeff Gorell [R]Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Asm. Curt Hagman [R]Sen. Isadore Hall [D]
Asm. Roger Hernandez [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Brian Jones [R]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Eric Linder [R]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Allan Mansoor [R]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]Sen. Holly Mitchell [D]Sen. Mike Morrell [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Brian Nestande [R]
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. John Perez [D]
Asm. Manuel Perez [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Sen. Norma Torres [D]Asm. Donald Wagner [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. Das Williams [D]Asm. Mariko Yamada [D]
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]

Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - Senate - Special Consent Cal ACR20 Logue (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-01AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2013.
2013-05-01AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:55 p.m.
2013-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2013-04-25SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 677.)
2013-04-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
2013-04-16SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2013-04-15AssemblyAmended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 914.)
2013-04-01AssemblyRead and amended. (Page 699.)
2013-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19).
2013-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2013-02-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2013-02-20AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=acr_20&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_20_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_20_bill_20130401_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_20_bill_20130415_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_20_bill_20130426_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_20_bill_20130501_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_20_vote_20130319_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_20_vote_20130425_1008AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback