CA ACR20 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Water Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-26 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-07 Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
2012-05-23 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-03 In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2012-05-03 Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4670.)
2012-04-26 From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2012-03-20 Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-03-19 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2011-03-07 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-02-17 From printer.
2011-02-16 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback