CA ACR2 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-20)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Spay Day USA 2011.
Title
Spay Day USA 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-22 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 424.) | |
2011-02-10 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 10). | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-05 | From printer. | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced. To print. |