CA ACR196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-18)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-18)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Foster Care Month.
Title
Foster Care Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Special Consent ACR196 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-12 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4576.) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |