CA ACR194 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-21)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Latino Education and Advocacy Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Latino Education and Advocacy Week.

Sponsors

Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent ACR194 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2018.
2018-05-01AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-23SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4765.)
2018-04-17SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-02SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-03-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4373.)
2018-03-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-03-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback