CA ACR191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-23)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Nonprofits Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Nonprofits Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Monique Limon [D]Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR191 Limón et al. By Leyva (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-21SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5459.)
2018-05-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 21).
2018-05-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-03-05AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback