CA ACR187 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-25)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Portuguese National Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Portuguese National Heritage Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Special Consent ACR187 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-17AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5284.)
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-19SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-06-18AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5863.)
2018-06-18AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-07AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7).
2018-05-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-02-28AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback