CA ACR186 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-18)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to School Breakfast Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Breakfast Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR186 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2018.
2018-04-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-04-05SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-12SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4192.)
2018-03-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 5).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-28AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback