CA ACR182 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-22)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Women in Construction Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Women in Construction Week.

Sponsors

Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR182 Baker et al. By Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2018.
2018-04-24AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-19SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3826.)
2018-04-09SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-04-05SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-12SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4198.)
2018-03-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-06AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 5).
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-23AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback