CA ACR18 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-24)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-24)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.
Title
Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR18 Dickinson By Price (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-03-25 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 457.) | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-15 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-14 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 542.) | |
2011-03-10 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). | |
2011-03-08 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-11 | From printer. | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced. To print. |