CA ACR176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-25)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Domestic Violence Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR176 Rubio et al. By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5898.)
2018-08-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-20AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 6386.)
2018-08-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13).
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-02-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback