CA ACR176 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-12 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-12 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Detective Monty L. Conley and Detective Joe R. Landin Memorial Highway.
Title
Detective Monty L. Conley and Detective Joe R. Landin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-12 - Assembly - ACR 176 CONWAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-12 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6176.) | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 4). | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2010-06-24 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-06-22 | From printer. | |
2010-06-21 | Introduced. To print. |