CA ACR173 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Little Saigon Cultural and Commercial District.
Title
Little Saigon Cultural and Commercial District.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - ACR 173 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent ACR173 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - ACR 173 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent ACR173 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - ACR 173 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6825.). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5705.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4901.) |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |