CA ACR171 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-23)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to National Caregivers Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Caregivers Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR171 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2018.
2018-03-27AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-03-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-03-22SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3547.)
2018-03-15SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-02-28SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-02-20SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4028.)
2018-02-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-02-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 12).
2018-02-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-02-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback