CA ACR170 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-19-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-19-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.
Title
California Holocaust Memorial Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent ACR170 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-01 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3843.) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4466.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |