CA ACR162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-17-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-17-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Rare Disease Day.
Title
Rare Disease Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR162 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3547.) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4094.) |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 16). |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |