CA ACR16 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Introduce a Girl to Engineering Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Introduce a Girl to Engineering Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-02-25AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-02-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 18).
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-26AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-01-25AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback