CA ACR16 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Deputy Shayne Daniel York Memorial Highway.
Title
Los Angeles County Sheriff's Deputy Shayne Daniel York
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR16 Wilk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - ACR 16 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - ACR 16 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1620.) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1017.) |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |