CA ACR16 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-22)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-22)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a Day of Remembrance.
Title
Day of Remembrance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR16 Eng By De León (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-27 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:05 p.m. | |
2011-06-23 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-06-23 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1535.) | |
2011-05-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-02-22 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-18 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 378.) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 10). | |
2011-02-08 | From printer. | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced. To print. |