CA ACR158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cancer Screen Week.
Title
Cancer Screen Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR158 Baker By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6083.) |
2018-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6706.) |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |