CA ACR156 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-21)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to June Dairy Month in California.
Title
June Dairy Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-07 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5251.) | |
2012-06-04 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-15 | From printer. | |
2012-05-14 | Introduced. To print. |