CA ACR155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-22)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Abraham Lincoln’s birthday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abraham Lincoln’s birthday.

Sponsors

Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR155 Baker et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2018.
2018-03-27AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-03-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-03-22SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-03-15SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-02-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-02-13SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-02-12AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 3966.)
2018-02-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 1).
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-13AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-01-12AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback