CA ACR154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Border Patrol Agent Jarod Charles Dittman Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR154 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - ACR 154 VOEPEL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-17AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5278.)
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-22SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-03-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4380.)
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19).
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-01-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-01-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback