CA ACR152 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-17-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-16 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-16 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Gold Star Mothers’ and Families’ Day.
Title
Gold Star Mothers’ and Families’ Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5873.) |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |