CA ACR151 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to gubernatorial appointments.
Title
Gubernatorial appointments: military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR151 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - ACR 151 VOEPEL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - ACR 151 VOEPEL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5041.) |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |