CA ACR149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway.
Title
Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR149 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - ACR 149 CHOI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - ACR 149 CHOI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5278.) |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4380.) |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |