CA ACR148 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-21)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Persian New Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Persian New Year.

Sponsors

Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR148 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2018.
2018-04-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4579.)
2018-04-05SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-20SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-03-19AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4294.)
2018-03-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 8).
2018-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-01-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback