CA ACR148 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to family planning funding and support.
Title
California family planning funding and support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). | |
2012-05-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended. | |
2012-05-17 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-16 | Amended. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (May 8). | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-02 | From printer. | |
2012-05-01 | Introduced. To print. |