CA ACR144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3941.)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Physician Anesthesiologist Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Anesthesiologist Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR144 Low By Glazer (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - ACR 144 Low Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3941.)
2020-02-20AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2020.
2020-02-20AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2020-02-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-02-18SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2020-02-12SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2020-01-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2020-01-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-01-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback