CA ACR144 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to character education in public schools.
Title
Public schools: character education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR144 Mullin (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - ACR 144 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - ACR 144 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4648.) |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4503.) |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |