CA ACR141 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-26-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-26-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.
Title
Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR141 Wood By Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3548.) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3889.) |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 3). |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |