CA ACR131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-21)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Sen. Jean Fuller [R]
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR131 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2913.)
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-11SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateMeasure version as revised September 7 corrected.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-09-07AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 3031.)
2017-09-07AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-09-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 5).
2017-09-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2017-09-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-08-30AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback